EP4203977 - STORAGE STABLE FILMS COMPRISING FIBRIN AND/OR FIBRINOGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitruvian Medical Devices, Inc. 969 Duncan Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | For all designated states Octapharma AG Seidenstrasse 2 8853 Lachen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/27] | For all designated states Vitruvian Medical Devices Inc. 969 Duncan Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | ||
For all designated states Octapharma AG Seidenstrasse 2 8853 Lachen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRIS, Hobart W. San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 02 /
ERICSON, Daniel Grant Rochester, MN 55902 / US | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21862957.4 | 31.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021US48401 | Priority number, date | US202063072753P | 31.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063072753 P | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022047367 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4203977 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/38, A61K38/36, A61L24/10, A61L24/00 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
A61L24/0015 (EP);
A61K9/7007 (US);
A61K33/38 (EP,US);
A61K35/16 (US);
A61K38/36 (US);
A61K38/363 (EP,US);
A61K38/4833 (EP);
A61L24/001 (EP);
A61L24/106 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K33/38, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/363, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/4833, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/27] | A61K33/38, A61K38/36, A61L24/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | FIBRIN UND/ODER FIBRINOGEN ENTHALTENDE LAGERSTABILE FOLIEN | [2023/27] | English: | STORAGE STABLE FILMS COMPRISING FIBRIN AND/OR FIBRINOGEN | [2023/27] | French: | FILMS STABLES AU STOCKAGE COMPRENANT DE LA FIBRINE ET/OU DU FIBRINOGÈNE | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 23.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7348411 (PETRESCU DORIN OLIMPIU [IT]); | [ID]WO2017210267 (ERICSON DANIEL GRANT [US]); | International search | [A]US2005062019 (YUKINOBU MASAYA [JP]) [A] 1 5* ; entire document *; | [A]US2015030678 (HARRIS HOBART W [US]) [A] 1-5 * ; entire document *; | [X]WO2015157681 (VITRUVIAN MEDICAL DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * ; entire document, especially abstract, [0004], [0006], [0007], [0029], [0036] *; | [A]US2016067371 (LAUB ORGAD [IL], et al) [A] 1-5 * ; entire document * |