EP4208263 - BREATHING APPARATUS AND CHARGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARHAM, Michael L. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
JENSEN, Douglas D. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
KREPEL, Kenneth J. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
HATINEN, Erik J. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
EBERMAN, Kevin W. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
AWISZUS, Steven T. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
MITCHELL, Dean Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8HT / GB | 08 /
ELLERBY, Chris Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8HT / GB | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/28] | Vollmers, Hans-Gerd 3M Deutschland GmbH 3M Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Straße 1 41453 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 21863800.5 | 27.08.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021IB57864 | Priority number, date | US202063074527P | 04.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063074527 P | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022049468 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4208263 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A62B18/00, A62B18/08, A62B7/12 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
A62B18/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | BEATMUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND LADESYSTEM | [2023/28] | English: | BREATHING APPARATUS AND CHARGING SYSTEM | [2023/28] | French: | APPAREIL RESPIRATOIRE ET SYSTÈME DE CHARGE | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 13.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007240716 (MARX ALVIN J [US]); | [A]JP2012036527 (MAKITA CORP); | [A]KR101772363B (JUNG KWEON [KR], et al); | [A]CN208503066U (QIN XINGANG); | [XY]US2019334357 (FURUI NOBUYASU [JP], et al) |