EP4209812 - OPTICAL CABLE AND OPTICAL CABLE MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph And Telephone Corporation 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHNO, Masatoshi Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 02 /
NAMAZUE, Akira Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 03 /
OSATO, Ken Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 04 /
YAMADA, Yusuke Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 05 /
MARUO, Yuta Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 06 /
SAKURAI, Akira Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 07 /
TETSUTANI, Shigekatsu Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 08 /
TANIOKA, Hiroaki Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Osha BWB 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/28] | Osha Liang 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 21864174.4 | 23.08.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021JP30854 | Priority number, date | JP20200147296 | 02.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020147296 | [2023/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022050116 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209812 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G02B6/449 (EP);
G02B6/448 (US);
G02B6/4404 (US);
G02B6/4413 (EP,US);
G02B6/4432 (US);
G02B6/4434 (US);
G02B6/4433 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES KABEL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR OPTISCHES KABEL | [2023/28] | English: | OPTICAL CABLE AND OPTICAL CABLE MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2023/28] | French: | CÂBLE OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CÂBLE OPTIQUE | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2023 | Translation filed | 19.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2014077869 (FUJIKURA LTD, et al); | [A]US2015370026 (HUDSON II HAROLD EDWARD [US], et al); | [A]JP2019056837 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [X]JP2019128363 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [A]JP2020076915 (FUJIKURA LTD) | by applicant | JP2020076915 |