EP4198608 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE IN WHICH SIGNAL LINES OF CAMERA ARE REDUCED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEON, Jina Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
SONG, Doukyoung Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
SONG, Hyoungil Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21864560.4 | 18.08.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021KR10921 | Priority number, date | KR20200113851 | 07.09.2020 Original published format: KR 20200113851 | KR20210016338 | 04.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210016338 | [2023/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022050599 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4198608 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G06F13/42, G06F3/01 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H04N19/42 (EP);
H04N23/57 (US);
G02B27/0172 (US);
G02B27/0176 (EP);
G06F13/4282 (EP);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/013 (EP,US);
H04N23/50 (US);
H04N23/66 (US);
H04N23/90 (US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,US);
G02B2027/014 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | G02B27/01, H04N5/225, H04N5/247 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT VERMINDERTEN SIGNALLEITUNGEN DER KAMERA | [2023/25] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE IN WHICH SIGNAL LINES OF CAMERA ARE REDUCED | [2023/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DANS LEQUEL DES LIGNES DE SIGNAL DE DISPOSITIF DE PRISE DE VUES SONT RÉDUITES | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2023 | Translation filed | 14.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 29.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2014372642 (SENGOKU SHOICHIRO [US], et al); | [Y]US9395543 (LAMB MATHEW J [US], et al); | International search | [A]KR20060033768 (BNB SOLUTIONS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20120075580 (UNIV KONKUK IND COOP CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20160018781 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]KR20170019136 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2020136285 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) |