EP4190961 - CONTROL METHOD FOR WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Drum Washing Machine Co., Ltd. No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | For all designated states Haier Smart Home Co., Ltd. No. 1 Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Zhiqiang Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 02 /
XU, Sheng Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 03 /
LV, Peishi Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Denninger Str. 169 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstraße 14 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21865826.8 | 19.08.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021CN113471 | Priority number, date | CN202010946900 | 10.09.2020 Original published format: CN202010946900 | [2023/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022052770 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4190961 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/04, D06F105/28, D06F23/02, // D06F33/38, D06F33/40, D06F103/68 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
D06F33/38 (EP,CN);
D06F23/025 (EP);
D06F33/40 (EP,CN);
D06F33/43 (CN);
D06F33/46 (CN);
D06F39/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/23] | D06F39/04, D06F105/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR WASCHMASCHINE | [2023/23] | English: | CONTROL METHOD FOR WASHING MACHINE | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR MACHINE À LAVER | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2023 | Translation filed | 02.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 23.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/22] | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN111041761 (QINGDAO HAIER WASHING MACH CO, et al) [Y] 1 * figure 24; example 9 *; | [Y]CN210596687U (QINGDAO HAIER WASHING MACH CO, et al) [Y] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP3666953 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1* paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0169]; figures 1-3, 5 *; | [Y]CN211395082U (PANASONIC HOME APPLIANCES R&D CT HANGZHOU CO LTD) [Y] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-2 * |