EP4212525 - 5-SUBSTITUTED INDOLE 3-AMIDE DERIVATIVE, PREPARATION METHOD AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Origiant Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd No. 901 And 902, Floor 9, Building 2, No. 16 Hemin Street, Chengdu Hi Tech Zone China (Sichuan) Pilot Free Trade Zone And No. 1001 And 1002, Floor 10 Chengdu, Sichuan 610000 / CN | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Shengyong Chengdu, Sichuan 610000 / CN | 02 /
LI, Linli Chengdu, Sichuan 610000 / CN | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 21865915.9 | 02.09.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021CN116256 | Priority number, date | CN202010943478 | 09.09.2020 Original published format: CN202010943478 | CN202110426935 | 20.04.2021 Original published format: CN202110426935 | [2023/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022052861 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4212525 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/06, A61K31/404, A61P29/00 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,CN,US);
A61P1/00 (EP,CN,US);
A61P25/28 (CN);
A61P29/00 (CN);
A61P35/00 (CN);
A61P37/06 (CN);
C07D209/42 (EP,CN,US);
C07D231/56 (EP,CN);
C07D401/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D403/10 (EP);
C07D405/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D413/04 (CN);
C07D413/10 (EP);
C07D413/14 (EP);
C07D417/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | 5-SUBSTITUIERTES INDOL-3-AMIDDERIVAT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/29] | English: | 5-SUBSTITUTED INDOLE 3-AMIDE DERIVATIVE, PREPARATION METHOD AND USE THEREOF | [2023/29] | French: | DÉRIVÉ D'INDOLE 3-AMIDE SUBSTITUÉ EN POSITION 5, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2023 | Translation filed | 10.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 17.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |