EP4210735 - MOTILE SPERM DOMAIN CONTAINING PROTEIN 2 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ImmuneWalk Therapeutics, Inc. 1 Blue Hill Plaza, Suite 1509 Pearl River, NY 10965 / US | [2023/51] |
Former [2023/29] | For all designated states Vascular Biogenics Ltd. 8 Hasatat St. Modiin 7178106 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENDEL, Itzhak 76349 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
YACOV, Niva 69364 Tel Aviv / IL | 03 /
FEIGE, Erez 50295 Hemed / IL | 04 /
BREITBART, Eyal 73127 Hashmona'im / IL | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/29] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21866187.4 | 09.09.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021IB58224 | Priority number, date | US202063076697P | 10.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063076697 P | US202163167317P | 29.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163167317 P | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022053985 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4210735 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C07K16/28, C07K16/30 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,IL);
C07K16/18 (IL,US);
A61K45/06 (IL,US);
A61P1/00 (IL,US);
A61P25/00 (IL,US);
A61P29/00 (IL,US);
A61P35/00 (IL);
A61P35/04 (IL,US);
A61P37/00 (IL,US);
C07K16/00 (IL);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,US);
A61P37/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | MOTILE SPERMADOMÄNE MIT PROTEIN-2-ANTIKÖRPERN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/29] | English: | MOTILE SPERM DOMAIN CONTAINING PROTEIN 2 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2023/29] | French: | ANTICORPS DE PROTÉINE 2 CONTENANT UN DOMAINE DU SPERME MOTILE ET LEURS MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 30.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018088403 (FUJIFILM WAKO PURE CHEMICAL CORP [JP], et al); | [A]US2019276561 (TAKAGI JUNICHI [JP]); | [A]WO2019175806 (VASCULAR BIOGENICS LTD [IL]); | [A]WO2019195409 (DRAGONFLY THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | [A]WO2020006486 (KRYSTAL BIOTECH INC [US]); | [A]WO2020069349 (UNIV COLORADO STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) |