EP4203467 - INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEKO, Tetsuo Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
TSUCHIYA, Takashi Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/26] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21866434.0 | 05.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021JP29150 | Priority number, date | JP20200150319 | 08.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020150319 | [2023/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022054474 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4203467 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/222, H04N9/68, H04N9/74, H04N23/661, H04N23/90, H04N5/262, H04N23/60 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H04N5/222 (EP);
G06V10/56 (US);
G06F16/907 (US);
G06F3/14 (US);
H04N23/60 (EP);
H04N23/662 (EP);
H04N23/84 (EP);
H04N23/90 (EP);
H04N5/2621 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/26] | H04N9/64, H04N5/222, H04N5/232 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM | [2023/26] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM | [2023/26] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2023 | Translation filed | 22.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 22.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004012821 (NAKAJIMA YASUMASA [JP]); | [XI]US2011064373 (DOSER INGO TOBIAS [DE], et al); | [XI]US2011102629 (YOSHIDA AKIMITSU [JP]); | [A]US2014176743 (LOEFFLER MARKUS EUGEN [US], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2002342048 (RICOH KK); | [Y]JP2005024654 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2006129508 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2009037405 (CANON KK); | [YX]JP2011066885 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2014233064 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [Y]JP2015514367 ; | [Y]JP2017225085 (OLYMPUS CORP) | by applicant | JP2012231459 | JP2014233064 |