EP4203670 - IMPROVING SPACING AND/OR VENTILATION CONDITIONS IN THE CULTIVATION ENVIRONMENT OF PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | 10.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soli Organic Inc. 3156 North Valley Pike Rockingham, VA 22802 / US | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENDERBOSCH, Antonius Henricus Jacobus 7141 NK Groenlo / NL | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21867433.1 | 07.09.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021US49258 | Priority number, date | NL20202026433 | 09.09.2020 Original published format: NL 2026433 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022055864 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4203670 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02, A01G9/00, A01G9/029, A01G9/28 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
A01G9/0295 (EP,IL);
A01G9/027 (IL,US);
A01G31/04 (EP,IL);
A01G31/06 (EP,IL);
A01G7/02 (EP,IL);
A01G9/045 (IL,US);
Y02P60/21 (EP,IL)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER ABSTANDS- UND/ODER LÜFTUNGSBEDINGUNGEN IN DER KULTURUMGEBUNG VON PFLANZEN | [2023/27] | English: | IMPROVING SPACING AND/OR VENTILATION CONDITIONS IN THE CULTIVATION ENVIRONMENT OF PLANTS | [2023/27] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DES CONDITIONS D'ESPACEMENT ET/OU DE VENTILATION DANS L'ENVIRONNEMENT DE CULTURE DE PLANTES | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 13.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9105461 (FAMIGRO OY [FI]) [A] 1-9, 21, 25-27 * entire document *; | [A]US6029399 (MERCER WAYNE A [US]) [A] 1-9, 21, 25-27 * entire document *; | [A]US2015047258 (LEWIS KENNETH [US], et al) [A] 1-9, 21, 25-27 * entire document *; | [A]US2015201551 (OHARA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9, 21, 25-27* entire document *; | [A]WO2017183969 (CREA-TECH INT B V [NL]) [A] 1-9, 21, 25-27 * entire document *; | [X]US2019141923 (RAY JR JAMES S [US]) [X] 25, 26 * entire document * |