EP4210715 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING SUGAMMADEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | For all designated states Werthenstein Biopharma GmbH Industrie Nord 1 6105 Werthenstein / CH | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERTO, David, J. Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
AVALLE, Paolo 6105 Schachen / CH | 03 /
CODAN, Lorenzo 6105 Schachen / CH | 04 /
LARPENT, Patrick 6105 Schachen / CH | 05 /
SCHOELL, Jochen 6105 Schachen / CH | 06 /
NEUHAUS, Jeffrey, S. West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 21867468.7 | 08.09.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021US49350 | Priority number, date | US202063076133P | 09.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063076133 P | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022055916 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4210715 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/724, C08L5/16, C08B37/00, A61K31/716 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
C08L5/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08B37/0012 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/724 (KR);
C08B37/0003 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Extension states | BA | 11.04.2023 | ME | 11.04.2023 | Validation states | MA | 11.04.2023 | MD | 11.04.2023 | TN | 11.04.2023 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SUGAMMADEX | [2023/29] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING SUGAMMADEX | [2023/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE SUGAMMADEX | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2023 | Observations by third parties | 11.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009202476 (PERRONE ROBERT KEVIN [US], et al); | [A]AU2017236669 (FRESENIUS KABI IPSUM S R L [IT]); | International search | [Y]WO2020028448 (PLIVA HRVATSKA D O O [HR], et al); |