EP4200583 - AIR QUALITY MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Project Canary, PBC 1200 17th Street, Floor 26 Denver, CO 80202 / US | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCOTT, Anna, Ailene Denver, CO 80202 / US | 02 /
ALKADI, Nasr, E. Denver, Colorado 80202 / US | 03 /
AZDOUD, Yan Denver, CO 80202 / US | 04 /
EICHENLAUB, Nate Denver, Colorado 80202 / US | 05 /
FOILES, William, J. Denver, Colorado 80202 / US | 06 /
KELLEY, Christopher, Daniel Austin, Texas 78704 / US | 07 /
KUPIS, Shyla Denver, Colorado 80202 / US | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/26] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 21867606.2 | 09.09.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021US49702 | Priority number, date | US202063076829P | 10.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063076829 P | US202163233694P | 16.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163233694 P | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022056152 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200583 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/26, G01N21/00, G01N33/00, G02B26/00 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G01N33/0036 (EP,US);
G01N21/3504 (EP,US);
G01N33/0075 (EP);
G01P13/02 (EP);
G01P13/045 (US);
G01N2021/3595 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | LUFTQUALITÄTSÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2023/26] | English: | AIR QUALITY MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2023/26] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE QUALITÉ D'AIR | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 07.10.2023 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009319058 (ROVAGLIO MAURIZIO [IT], et al) [A] 1-9* entire document *; | [XY]US2010268480 (PRINCE DENNIS SCOTT [CA]) [X] 1,2,4 * entire document (especially Figs. 1-19, 20A-20E, 21, 22A-22E, 23A-23E, 24A,-24E, 25-29, 30A, 30B, 31-37, Abstract & para [0006], [0043], [0045], [0045], [0047], [0048], [0049], [0052], [0079], [0082], [0084], [0093], [0108]). * [Y] 3, 5-9; | [A]US2015185194 (PRINCE DENNIS SCOTT [CA], et al) [A] 1-9 * entire document, especially para [0011], [0047], [0055]-[0057], [0069], [0146]). *; | [Y]EP3001115 (XIAOMI INC [CN]) [Y] 5-9 * entire document (especially Fig. 6, 7 & para [0016], [0020]-[0024], [0097]). *; | [Y]US10031040 (SMITH CLINTON J [US], et al) [Y] 3 * entire document (especially COL. 4, lines 43-49). * |