EP4210751 - ANTI-CERULOPLASMIN ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | 17.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alexion Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 121 Seaport Boulevard Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POTTER, David George Montgomery, Texas 77356 / US | 02 /
DZIELAWA, Jennifer Ann Montgomery, Texas 77356 / US | 03 /
CARTER, Brenda Sue Montgomery, Texas 77356 / US | 04 /
MA, Mark Boston, Massachusetts 02210 / US | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 21867683.1 | 10.09.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021US49890 | Priority number, date | US202063077155P | 11.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063077155 P | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022056278 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4210751 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/38, C12Q1/26, G01N33/84 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
G01N33/84 (EP,US);
A61K31/132 (EP);
A61K31/198 (EP);
A61K33/24 (EP);
A61K33/30 (EP);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
G01N33/573 (US);
G01N33/6893 (EP);
C07K2317/565 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | ANTI-CERULOPLASMIN-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2023/29] | English: | ANTI-CERULOPLASMIN ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF | [2023/29] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-CÉRULOPLASMINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 12.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6010903 (HIYAMUTA SHUICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2010312139 (DASH PRAMOD K [US], et al); | [A]US2017252458 (ALBONE EARL F [US], et al); | [A]WO2019085804 (UNIV BEIJING [CN]); | [A]WO2020095866 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [PA]WO2021050850 (ALEXION PHARMA INC [US], et al) |