EP4214084 - ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evos Technology Pty Ltd 3/17 Gould Road Herston, QLD 4006 / AU | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROSSMAN, Chris 4006 Brisbane / AU | 02 /
WEERATUNGA, Seshan 4006 Brisbane / AU | 03 /
SALGADO, Marcelo 4006 Brisbane / AU | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 21867947.0 | 16.09.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021AU51071 | Priority number, date | AU20200903308 | 16.09.2020 Original published format: AU 2020903308 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022056590 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4214084 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/65 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
B60L53/126 (EP,AU,US);
B60L53/65 (EP,AU,US);
B60L53/665 (EP,AU,US);
B60L53/51 (EP,AU);
B60L53/53 (EP,AU);
B60L53/66 (EP,AU);
B60L53/67 (EP,AU,US);
B60L53/68 (EP,AU,US);
G06F21/44 (US);
G07C5/008 (AU);
H04W4/021 (AU);
B60L2240/72 (EP);
G01S2205/001 (AU);
G06Q20/145 (US);
G06Q50/06 (US);
G06Q50/40 (AU);
H02J2310/10 (AU);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | ELEKTROFAHRZEUGLADESYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2023/30] | English: | ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2023/30] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CHARGE DE VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2015123619 (MARATHE NIKHIL S [US], et al); | [Y]WO2016073269 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [XY]US2018012433 (RICCI CHRISTOPHER P [US]); | [XY]KR101926482B |