EP4213711 - INTEGRATED MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd Suite 2.02, Level 2 54 Miller Street North Sydney, NSW 2060 / AU | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CURRAN, Peter Sydney, New South Wales 2060 / AU | 02 /
SPOONER, Michael Sydney, New South Wales 2060 / AU | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 21867964.5 | 20.09.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021AU51095 | Priority number, date | AU20200903382 | 21.09.2020 Original published format: AU 2020903382 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022056607 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4213711 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61F13/42 | [2024/43] | CPC: |
A61B5/6808 (EP,AU,US);
A61B5/0816 (EP,AU,US);
A61B5/14551 (EP,AU);
A61B5/14552 (US);
A61B5/72 (EP,AU,US);
A61F13/42 (EP,US);
A61F13/496 (AU);
G01K13/223 (AU);
G08B21/0446 (AU);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,AU,US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,AU);
A61B5/01 (EP,AU);
|
Former IPC [2023/30] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/30] | English: | INTEGRATED MONITORING SYSTEM | [2023/30] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE INTÉGRÉ | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008058740 (SULLIVAN SHAWN J [US], et al); | [X]US2014121473 (BANET MATT [US], et al); | [X]WO2015172246 (EM MEDICAL LLC [CA]); | [A]WO2017131276 (DONGSEO TECHNOLOGY HEADQUTERS [KR]); | [X]US2019374122 (KUENZI RODNEY [US], et al); | [X]EP3099224 (RHYTHM DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC [US]) |