EP4165086 - PD-L1 ANTIBODIES, FUSION PROTEINS, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzhou Neologics Bioscience Co., Ltd. Unit 605, Building B2 No. 218 Xinghu Street Suzhou, Jiangsu 215023 / CN | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Binbin Suzhou, Jiangsu 215023 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Dong Suzhou, Jiangsu 215023 / CN | 03 /
DONG, Jinyu Suzhou, Jiangsu 215023 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Yu Suzhou, Jiangsu 215023 / CN | 05 /
ZHOU, Zhou Suzhou, Jiangsu 215023 / CN | 06 /
SHAO, Liegang Suzhou, Jiangsu 215023 / CN | 07 /
ZHAO, Lianqi Suzhou, Jiangsu 215023 / CN | 08 /
DONG, Xin Suzhou, Jiangsu 215023 / CN | 09 /
WANG, Baiyang Suzhou, Jiangsu 215023 / CN | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 21868643.4 | 15.09.2021 | [2023/16] | WO2021CN118481 | Priority number, date | WO2020CN115572 | 16.09.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/115572 | WO2020CN127811 | 10.11.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/127811 | WO2020CN132740 | 30.11.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/132740 | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022057821 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4165086 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K19/00, C07K14/71, A61K38/17, A61K39/395, A61K39/00, A61P35/00, C12N15/62, C12N15/63 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/71 (EP,US);
C07K16/2896 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/79 (EP);
C07K16/2827 (EP);
C12N15/62 (EP);
C12N15/86 (US);
C07K2317/24 (EP);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/70 (EP);
C07K2317/76 (EP);
C07K2317/92 (EP);
C07K2317/94 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/21 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Title | German: | PD-L1-ANTIKÖRPER, FUSIONSPROTEINE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2023/16] | English: | PD-L1 ANTIBODIES, FUSION PROTEINS, AND USES THEREOF | [2023/16] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-PD-L1, PROTÉINES DE FUSION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2023/16] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 27.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006096515 (BIOREXIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORP [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007047504 (BIOREXIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORP [US], et al); | [Y]WO2010077634 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013079174 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US2015225483 (LO KIN-MING [US]); | [Y]EP3623389 (JIANGSU HENGRUI MEDICINE CO [CN], et al) |