EP4216636 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/30] | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku, Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAYA Shigeru Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
AIO Kosuke Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
HIRATA Ryuichi Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA Yusuke Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/30] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21869210.1 | 03.09.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021JP32451 | Priority number, date | JP20200157023 | 18.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020157023 | [2023/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022059523 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4216636 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W28/04, H04W84/12 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04W28/04 (KR);
H04L1/1867 (US);
H04L1/1614 (EP);
H04L1/1628 (EP);
H04L1/1812 (KR);
H04L1/1864 (KR);
H04L1/1887 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04W76/15 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,KR);
H04L1/1874 (EP);
H04L69/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2023/30] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2023/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2023 | Translation filed | 06.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 12.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2019195505 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0054] , [0091] , [0132] , [0136] * [I] 7-9; | [X]WO2020172576 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [0040] , [0199] - [0201] *; | [X] - TAEWON SONG (LG ELECTRONICS), "Multi-link Acknowledgement", vol. 802.11 EHT; 802.11be, no. 3, (20200115), pages 1 - 15, IEEE DRAFT; 11-19-1887-03-00BE-MULTI-LINK-ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.11/dcn/19/11-19-1887-03-00be-multi-link-acknowledgement.pptx, (20200115), XP068165302 [X] 1,6,10-15 * pages 2-5,7 * | International search | [YAX] - Taewon Song (LG Electronics), "Multi-link Acknowledgement", IEEE Draft; 11-19-1887-03-00be-multi-link-acknowledgement, IEEE-SA mentor, Piscataway, NJ USA, Piscataway, NJ USA , (20200115), vol. 802.11 EHT; 802.11be, no. 3, pages 1 - 15, XP068165302 [Y] 7, 14, 18 * in particular, pp. 3, 6 * [A] 16 [X] 1-6, 8-13, 15, 17, 19-20 [Y] 7, 14, 18 | by applicant | JP2019080320 |