EP4215770 - BEARING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIZUME, Shohei Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-8678 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Keiichi Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-8678 / JP | 03 /
HAMAKITA, Yasuyuki Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-8678 / JP | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Bockhorni & Brüntjen Partnerschaft Patentanwälte mbB Agnes-Bernauer-Straße 88 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/30] | Brüntjen, Thorsten Bockhorni & Brüntjen Partnerschaft Patentanwälte mbB Agnes-Bernauer-Straße 88 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21869259.8 | 08.09.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021JP32958 | Priority number, date | JP20200154234 | 15.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020154234 | [2023/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022059572 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4215770 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/16, F16C35/12, F16C41/00 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
F16C19/163 (EP);
F16C41/00 (KR);
F16C41/008 (EP,US);
F16C19/18 (KR);
F16C19/52 (EP,US);
F16C19/548 (EP);
F16C35/067 (EP,US);
F16C35/12 (EP,KR);
G08C17/00 (EP,KR);
F16C2202/32 (EP);
F16C2206/44 (EP);
F16C2206/48 (EP);
F16C2206/56 (EP);
F16C2233/00 (EP,US);
F16C2322/39 (EP);
F16C35/077 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | LAGERVORRICHTUNG | [2023/30] | English: | BEARING DEVICE | [2023/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TYPE PALIER | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2023 | Translation filed | 14.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS55151923U ; | [Y]JPS6192320 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [A]JP2013017177 (NTN SNR ROULEMENTS); | [Y]JP2020060227 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2003028151 |