EP4195124 - WAREHOUSING DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Wodong Tianjun Information Technology Co., Ltd. Room A402, 4/F, No. 2 Building No. 18 Kechuang 11th Street Economic and Technological Development Zone 100176 Beijing / CN | For all designated states Beijing Jingdong Century Trading Co., Ltd. Room 201, 2/F, Block C No. 18 Kechuang 11th Street Economic and Technological Development Zone Beijing 100176 / CN | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Gaochun Beijing 100176 / CN | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21870800.6 | 30.04.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021CN91640 | Priority number, date | CN20201132679 | 27.09.2020 Original published format: CN202011032679 | [2023/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022062412 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4195124 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0875 (CN);
G06F16/2282 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR LAGERHALTUNGSDATEN, MEDIUM UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/24] | English: | WAREHOUSING DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES D'ENTREPOSAGE, SUPPORT ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2023 | Translation filed | 08.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CN106971249 (BEIJING WAJIU E-COMMERCE CO LTD); | [Y]CN107256473 (BEIJING HUIYINGTIANXIA NETWORK TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2018268368 (CHEN YUEYANG [CN], et al); | [A]CN109272265 (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD) |