EP4209067 - MOBILITY-AWARE ANTENNA BEAM TRACKING FOR MOVING COMMUNICATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHARI, Jalal Khamse Ottawa, Ontario K2B 8S5 / CA | 02 /
MAAREF, Amine Ottawa, Ontario K2T 0B7 / CA | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21871202.4 | 26.08.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021CN114832 | Priority number, date | US202017027905 | 22.09.2020 Original published format: US202017027905 | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022062829 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209067 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00, H04W72/04, H04B7/185, H04B7/06 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04B7/086 (US);
H04B7/0417 (US);
H04B7/0617 (US);
H04B7/063 (EP);
H04B7/088 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/28] | H04W56/00, H04W72/04, H04B7/185 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | MOBILITÄTSBEWUSSTE ANTENNENSTRAHLVERFOLGUNG FÜR BEWEGLICHE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/28] | English: | MOBILITY-AWARE ANTENNA BEAM TRACKING FOR MOVING COMMUNICATION DEVICES | [2023/28] | French: | SUIVI DU FAISCEAU D'ANTENNE EN FONCTION DE LA MOBILITÉ POUR LES DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION MOBILES | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 30.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |