EP4209890 - FILE TRANSMISSION METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Fanxiang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Xueer Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LU, Yuedong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21871528.2 | 23.09.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021CN119830 | Priority number, date | CN20201145443 | 28.09.2020 Original published format: CN202011045443 | [2023/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022063159 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209890 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0486, G06F3/04883, G06F3/14, G09G5/14, // G09G5/12 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
G06F3/0486 (EP);
G06F1/1698 (EP);
G06F16/16 (EP);
G06F3/0481 (EP);
H04L12/1827 (EP);
H04L51/224 (EP);
H04L67/06 (EP);
G06F3/1423 (EP);
G06F3/1446 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/28] | G06F3/14, G06F16/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | DATEIÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/28] | English: | FILE TRANSMISSION METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE | [2023/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE FICHIER ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2023 | Translation filed | 04.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 08.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2632188 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0083]; figures 7,8a-8d *; | [X] - MARQUARDT NICOLAI ET AL, "Gradual engagement facilitating information exchange between digital devices as a function of proximity", PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRD ACM CONFERENCE ON DATA AND APPLICATION SECURITY AND PRIVACY, CODASPY '13, ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA, (20121111), doi:10.1145/2396636.2396642, ISBN 978-1-4503-1890-7, pages 31 - 40, XP058985017 [X] 1-15 * page 37 - page 39; figures 6-10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2396636.2396642 |