EP4219441 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ESTER-BASED COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/31] | For all designated states Lg Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hyun Kyu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
MOON, Jeong Ju Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Eun Suk Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
HEO, Yun Gon Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Joo Ho Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 21872880.6 | 17.09.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021KR12895 | Priority number, date | KR20200124125 | 24.09.2020 Original published format: KR 20200124125 | [2023/31] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022065852 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4219441 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/08, C07C67/58, B01J31/12, C07C69/80, B01J31/02 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
C07C67/08 (EP,KR);
B01J31/0212 (EP);
B01J31/12 (EP);
B01J31/122 (EP,KR);
C07C67/56 (KR);
C07C67/58 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/08, C07C69/80 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/31] | C07C67/08, C07C67/56, C07C67/58, B01J31/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF ESTERBASIS | [2023/31] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ESTER-BASED COMPOSITION | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION À BASE D'ESTER | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2023 | Translation filed | 06.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008110306 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al); | [Y]KR101663586B (AEKYUNGPETROCHEMICAL CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20200063577 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]WO2005051885 (DAVY PROCESS TECHN LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20160024698 (SK CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See claims 1, 2 and 5-9. *; | [A]KR101663586B (AEKYUNGPETROCHEMICAL CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See claims 1-8 and 11; paragraphs [0011], [0012], [0020]-[0023] and [0034]; and example 1. *; | [A]KR20180035522 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20190027623 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14* See entire document. * | by applicant | KR101354141B | - MUSTAFIZUR RAHMANCHRISTOPHER S. BRAZEL, "The plasticizer market: an assessment of traditional plasticizers and research trends to meet new challenges", Progress in Polymer Science, (20040000), vol. 29, doi:10.1016/J.PROGPOLYMSCI.2004.10.001, pages 1223 - 1248, XP002711921 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.PROGPOLYMSCI.2004.10.001 | - N. R. JANJUA et al., "Systemic Uptake of Diethyl Phthalate, Dibutyl Phthalate, and Butyl Paraben Following Whole-body Topical Application and Reproductive and Thyroid Hormone Levels in Humans", Environmental Science and Technology, (20080000), vol. 42, pages 7522 - 7527 |