EP4216818 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING GAIT IN HUMANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walkbeat AB Medicinaregatan 8A 413 90 Göteborg / SE | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHANDELWAL, Siddhartha 411 43 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
BRASIL BENTES JUNIOR, Joao Elias 414 63 Göteborg / SE | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 21873069.5 | 27.09.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021SE50941 | Priority number, date | SE20200051119 | 25.09.2020 Original published format: SE 2051119 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022066095 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4216818 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/11, A63B24/00, A61B5/00 | [2024/35] | CPC: |
A61B5/112 (EP,US);
A01K15/027 (EP);
A61B5/1126 (EP,US);
A61B5/6828 (US);
A61B5/6829 (EP);
A61B5/726 (EP);
G16H50/70 (US);
A61B2503/40 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/31] | A61B5/11, A63B24/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GANGANALYSE BEI MENSCHEN | [2023/31] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING GAIT IN HUMANS | [2023/31] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DE DÉMARCHE CHEZ LES HUMAINS | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003139692 (BARREY ERIC [FR], et al); | [Y]US2013218053 (KAISER WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [Y]US2014066816 (MCNAMES JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]WO2014043757 (NAT ICT AUSTRALIA LTD [AU]); | [A]EP3090685 (SWATCH GROUP RES & DEV LTD [CH]); | [Y]US2017042453 (CHEUNG JEFFREYTAI KIN [HK]); | [Y]US2017273601 (WANG CHUNG-CHE CHARLES [US], et al); | [A]CN108309303 (SHANGHAI 9TH PEOPLES HOSPITAL SHANGHAI JIAOTONG UNIV SCHOOL MEDICINE); | [A]CN105268171B ; | [A]CN108814617 (SHENZHEN GYENNO TECH CO LTD); | [Y]US2019150793 (BARTH JENS [DE], et al); | [Y]US2019328284 (FINCH MARK [NZ], et al); | [A]US10610131 (THOMPSON JOHN D [US], et al); | [PA]US2021090418 (JEONG MIN GI [KR], et al); | [PA]WO2021161314 (OWLYTICS HEALTHCARE LTD [IL]); |