EP4217053 - CARDIAC PACING VIA THE DISTAL PURKINJE SYSTEM WITH ULTRA-SHORT PULSE WIDTHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rocky Mountain Biphasic, Inc. 4408 Washburn Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 54410 / US | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOWER, Morton M. Denver, Colorado 80209 / US | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 21873129.7 | 23.07.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021US42944 | Priority number, date | US202063082078P | 23.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063082078 P | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022066273 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4217053 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
A61N1/36843 (EP);
A61N1/365 (US);
A61N1/056 (US);
A61N1/378 (US);
A61N1/0563 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | HERZREIZUNG ÜBER DAS DISTALE PURKINJE-SYSTEM MIT ULTRAKURZEN PULSBREITEN | [2023/31] | English: | CARDIAC PACING VIA THE DISTAL PURKINJE SYSTEM WITH ULTRA-SHORT PULSE WIDTHS | [2023/31] | French: | STIMULATION CARDIAQUE PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE DU SYSTÈME DE PURKINJE DISTAL AYANT DES LARGEURS D'IMPULSION ULTRA-COURTES | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 14.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5620468 (MONGEON LUC R [US], et al) [A] 1-20* ; entire document, especially Abstract; col. 4, In 1-24; col. 4, In 41-43 *; | [YA]WO0001443 (MOWER MORTON M [US]) [Y] 13-14, 17-19 * ; entire document, especially pg. 1, In 2-4; pg. 8, In 7-20; Table 1. * [A] 15-16; | [A]US6337995 (MOWER MORTON M [US]) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document, especially Abstract, Fig. 5; col. 6, In 50-52; col. 7, In 18-27; col. 8, In 4-22; col. 10, In 7-10. *; | [A]US2003083727 (CASAVANT DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 9-11, 15-16 * ; entire document, especially Abstract, para. [0022], [0038]. *; | [XYA]US2006136001 (ORTEGA DANIEL F [AR], et al) [X] 1-6, 8, 12 * ; entire document, especially Abstract, Fig. 9, para. [0083]-[0084]. * [Y] 13-14, 17-19 [A] 7, 15-16, 20; | [XA]US2013158621 (DING JIANG [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * ; entire document, especially para. [0008]-[0009], [0066], [0086]. * [A] 9-11, 16, 20; | [A]US2013184774 (ZHU QINGSHENG [US], et al) [A] 7 * ; entire document, especially Abstract, para. [0096]. * |