EP4217709 - METHODS FOR CONTINUOUS MEASUREMENT OF BASELINE NOISE IN A FLOW CYTOMETER AND SYSTEMS FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive, MC110 Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417 / US | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGE, Peter Goleta, California 93117 / US | 02 /
WEI, Lingjie Milpitas, California US / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Peter Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | 04 /
ROBERTS, David A. San Jose, California 95123 / US | 05 /
OWSLEY, Keegan Campbell, California 95008 / US | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 21873144.6 | 16.08.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021US46111 | Priority number, date | US202063081660P | 22.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063081660 P | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022066316 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4217709 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/10, G01N15/1429, // G01N15/14 | [2024/40] | CPC: |
G01N15/1429 (EP,US);
G01N15/1012 (EP,US);
G01N15/1459 (EP,US);
G01N15/149 (US);
G01N2015/1402 (US);
G01N21/6456 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/31] | G01N15/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN MESSUNG DES GRUNDLINIENRAUSCHENS IN EINEM DURCHFLUSSZYTOMETER UND SYSTEME DAFÜR | [2023/31] | English: | METHODS FOR CONTINUOUS MEASUREMENT OF BASELINE NOISE IN A FLOW CYTOMETER AND SYSTEMS FOR SAME | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE MESURE CONTINUE DE BRUIT DE LIGNE DE BASE DANS UN CYTOMÈTRE DE FLUX ET SYSTÈMES ASSOCIÉS | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2016231357 (TARATORIN ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [Y]US2020072727 (LIN JONATHAN [US], et al) |