EP4216952 - TREATMENT OF COGNITIVE DYSFUNCTION WITH PYRROLOPYRIDINE-ANILINE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | 01.12.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NFlection Therapeutics, Inc. 867 Boylston Street, 5th Floor, 1116 Boston, Massachusetts 02116 / US | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POWALA, Christopher Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US | 02 /
PLOTKIN, Scott Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US | 03 /
SARIN, Kavita Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US | 04 /
MOREFIELD, Elaine Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US | 05 /
SHAHRYARI, Jahanbanoo Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US | 06 /
FENN, Peter Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 21873410.1 | 23.09.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021US51710 | Priority number, date | US202063082595P | 24.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063082595 P | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022066875 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4216952 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/437, C07D471/04, A61P35/00 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
A61K9/0043 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/0073 (EP,IL,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON KOGNITIVEN STÖRUNGEN MIT PYRROLOPYRIDINANILINVERBINDUNGEN | [2023/31] | English: | TREATMENT OF COGNITIVE DYSFUNCTION WITH PYRROLOPYRIDINE-ANILINE COMPOUNDS | [2023/31] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'UN DYSFUNCTIONNEMENT COGNITIF AVEC DES COMPOSÉS PYRROLOPYRIDINE-ANILINE | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 07.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014210538 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-7 * ; entire document *; | [A]WO2018213810 (NFLECTION THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * para [0067] *; | [A]US2019270734 (GASSER RODOLFO [CH], et al) [A] 1-7 * ; para [0025], [0386] *; | [A]WO2020101878 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [A] 1-7* ; entire document *; | [A] - Klesse Laura J., Jordan Justin T., Radtke Heather B., Rosser Tena, Schorry Elizabeth, Ullrich Nicole, Viskochil David, Knight Pamela, Plotkin Scott R., Yohay Kaleb, "The Use of MEK Inhibitors in Neurofibromatosis Type 1-Associated Tumors and Management of Toxicities", THE ONCOLOGIST, (20200701), vol. 25, no. 7, doi:10.1634/theoncologist.2020-0069, ISSN 1083-7159, pages e1109 - e1116, XP055928768 [A] 1-7 * ; pg. e1109, abstract, left col, Introduction: para 1 . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/theoncologist.2020-0069 |