EP4198775 - ABNORMAL USER AUDITING METHOD AND APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIGO TECHNOLOGY PTE. LTD. 30 Pasir Panjang Road, 15-31A Mapletree Business City Singapore 117440 / SG | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yiyong Guangzhou, Guangdong 511402 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Qiushi Guangzhou, Guangdong 511402 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Zhun Guangzhou, Guangdong 511402 / CN | 04 /
JING, Xue Guangzhou, Guangdong 511402 / CN | 05 /
XIANG, Wei Guangzhou, Guangdong 511402 / CN | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Yang, Shu Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21874154.4 | 30.08.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021CN115230 | Priority number, date | CN20201166006 | 30.09.2020 Original published format: CN202011066006 | [2023/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022068493 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4198775 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/18, G06F16/9536, G06F16/2458, G06Q50/00, G06F16/906 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
G06F16/9536 (EP,CN);
G06F17/18 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/535 (US);
G06F16/2465 (CN);
G06F16/906 (EP);
G06Q50/01 (EP);
H04L67/1396 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/11] | G06F17/18, G06F16/9536, G06F16/2458, G06Q50/00 | ||
Former IPC [2023/25] | G06F17/18, G06F16/9536, G06F16/2458 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PRÜFUNG ABNORMALER BENUTZER, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/25] | English: | ABNORMAL USER AUDITING METHOD AND APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AUDIT D'UTILISATEURS ANORMAUX, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2023 | Translation filed | 16.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008282324 (HOAL MARY KAY [US]); | [A]CN103853841 (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM); | [I]US2016261530 (CECCHI GUILLERMO A [US], et al); | [I]CN110929799 (SHANGHAI SHENGPAY ELECTRONIC PAYMENT SERVICE CO LTD) |