EP4224402 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOGAMI, Atsushi Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Canon Europe Limited European Intellectual Property Group 4 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1AF / GB | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 21875556.9 | 28.09.2021 | [2023/32] | WO2021JP35476 | Priority number, date | JP20200164108 | 29.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020164108 | JP20200164109 | 29.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020164109 | [2023/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022071255 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4224402 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/20 | [2024/44] | CPC: |
G01M5/0033 (EP,US);
G01M5/0008 (US);
G01N21/8851 (US);
G06F18/24323 (EP);
G06Q10/20 (EP);
G06Q50/08 (EP);
G06Q50/163 (EP);
G06Q50/26 (EP);
G06T7/0004 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/32] | G06Q50/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2023/32] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2023/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2023 | Translation filed | 24.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AY]JP2011203090 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [AY]JP2018147314 (EAST NIPPON EXPRESSWAY CO LTD, et al); | [AY]JP2018198053 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2019200120 (RAILWAY TECHNICAL RES INST) | by applicant | JP4279159B | JP2017173993 | JP2020164108 | JP2020164109 |