EP4205716 - UNDERPANTS-TYPE ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAKAMI, Yusuke Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
NAGAI, Takahito Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Suguru Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 04 /
WANG, Yinhua Shanghai 201700 / CN | 05 /
ZHENG, Lingshuang Shanghai 201700 / CN | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21875813.4 | 30.09.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021JP36271 | Priority number, date | CN20201159957 | 30.09.2020 Original published format: CN202011059957 | CN20201157355 | 30.09.2020 Original published format: CN202011057355 | [2023/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022071517 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4205716 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/494, A61F13/51, A61F13/514 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
A61F13/496 (EP);
A61F13/49406 (EP);
A61F13/51405 (EP);
A61F2013/5145 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/27] | A61F13/494, A61F13/51 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | SAUGFÄHIGER ARTIKEL VOM UNTERHOSEN-TYP | [2023/27] | English: | UNDERPANTS-TYPE ABSORBENT ARTICLE | [2023/27] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT DE TYPE CULOTTE | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2023 | Translation filed | 28.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 09.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2004344529 (KAO CORP) [X] 1,2,14,15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0015] - [0 17] - [0019] - [0 25]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 3-13; | [I]US2011046590 (MUKAI HIROTOMO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15* figure 1; claims 1-7 *; | [XY]JP2015058034 (HAKUJUJI CO LTD) [X] 1,14,15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0050]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-13 | International search | [Y]JP2001327534 (UNI CHARM CORP) [Y] 21-22 * paragraphs [0009]-[0010], fig. 1-4 *; | [Y]JP2003220091 (UNI CHARM CORP) [Y] 1-4, 14-15 * paragraphs [0017]-[0030], fig. 1-5 *; | [YAX]JP2004344529 (KAO CORP) [Y] 1-4, 8, 14-15, 22 [A] 5-7, 9-13, 20, 25 [X] 1-2, 14-19, 21, 23-24; | [YAX]JP2015058034 (HAKUJUJI CO LTD) [Y] 21-22 [A] 2-13, 20[X] 1, 14-19, 23-25; | [Y]JP2016087286 (KAO CORP) [Y] 1, 8, 14-15 * paragraphs [0009]-[0035], fig. 1-5 * | by applicant | JP2017113186 |