EP4227458 - CLOTHING PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jongryul Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jeongwoong Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
KANG, Woocheol Seoul 08592 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Gyudae Seoul 08592 / KR | 05 /
SHIN, Jinhyouk Seoul 08592 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Youngsoo Seoul 08592 / KR | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 21877937.9 | 05.10.2021 | [2023/33] | WO2021KR13587 | Priority number, date | KR20200127912 | 05.10.2020 Original published format: KR 20200127912 | KR20210017592 | 08.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210017592 | [2023/33] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022075685 | Date: | 14.04.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4227458 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/24, // D06F58/20 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
D06F58/24 (EP,US);
D06F58/10 (US);
D06F58/26 (US);
D06F58/206 (EP);
Y02B40/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/33] | D06F58/22, D06F58/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Title | German: | KLEIDUNGSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/33] | English: | CLOTHING PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2023/33] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE VÊTEMENTS | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2023 | Translation filed | 04.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010192397 (KIM NA EUN [KR], et al); | [I]US2016369448 (OZDEMIR MUSA [TR], et al); | [XI]US2018245271 (BOCCHINO GIANLUCA [IT], et al); | [XI]KR20190128484 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | International search | [Y]KR20120110506 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]JP2014018446 (PANASONIC CORP); | [Y]KR101588137B (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]KR20160059933 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2016209332 (TOSHIBA LIFESTYLE PRODUCTS & SERVICES CORP) | by applicant | JPS5581914 | JPS55115455 | JPS5763724 | JPS57124674 | KR20190121656 |