EP4226236 - RECIPIENT PROFILE-BASED GENERATION OF SCAN IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHASKARAN, Shinoj Bangalore 560103 / IN | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/33] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21878705.9 | 09.06.2021 | [2023/33] | WO2021US70686 | Priority number, date | IN202041044080 | 09.10.2020 Original published format: IN202041044080 | [2023/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022076955 | Date: | 14.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4226236 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 14.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
H04N1/00514 (EP);
H04N1/00225 (US);
H04N1/00517 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Title | German: | EMPFÄNGERPROFILBASIERTE ERZEUGUNG VON SCANBILDERN | [2023/33] | English: | RECIPIENT PROFILE-BASED GENERATION OF SCAN IMAGES | [2023/33] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'IMAGES DE BALAYAGE À BASE DE PROFIL DE DESTINATAIRE | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006072144 (DOWLING ERIC M [CR], et al); | [A]US2007223051 (HENRY MATTHEW K [US], et al); | [A]US2008117473 (JULIANO CORNELL [US]); | [A]US8085423 (DOWLING ERIC MORGAN [CR], et al) |