EP4207938 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/27] | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku, Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIO, Kosuke Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
SAKODA, Kazuyuki Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
SUGAYA, Shigeru Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/27] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21879740.5 | 18.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021JP30105 | Priority number, date | JP20200172514 | 13.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020172514 | [2023/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022079998 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4207938 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W92/20, H04W48/16, H04W88/08 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H04W28/14 (EP);
H04B7/026 (US);
H04W28/0278 (US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
H04W92/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2023/27] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2023/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2023 | Translation filed | 31.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 24.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016234802 (YANG XUN [CN], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [XAY]CN110691381 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,11 * see the references in "EP" * [A] 3-10 [Y] 2; | [Y]CN110944358 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 2 * see the references in "EP" *; | [A]WO2020191753 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [P]EP3806535 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [P] * paragraphs [0110] , [ 112] * * paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0223] * * figures 1,17 *; | [P]EP3846529 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [P] * paragraphs [0049] , [0 59] , [ 127] , [ 128] , [ 134] - [0137] * | International search | [Y]WO2008065697 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0084]-[0095] *; | [Y]WO2011155256 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0022]-[0045], [0051], [0156] *; | [A]JP2019036874 (NTT DOCOMO INC) [A] 1-11* whole document * |