EP4228348 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RESOURCE SELECTION IN SIDELINK COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | 15.12.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY 12, Heolleung-ro, Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | For all designated states Kia Corporation 12, Heolleung-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | For all designated states WONKWANG UNIVERSITY CENTER FOR INDUSTRY-ACADEMY COOPERATION 460, Iksan-daero Iksan-si, Jeollabuk-do 54538 / KR | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAHN, Gene Back Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18280 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, In Yong Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18280 / KR | 03 /
SON, Hyuk Min Iksan-si, Jeollabuk-do 54653 / KR | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 21880388.0 | 06.10.2021 | [2023/33] | WO2021KR13700 | Priority number, date | US202063090472P | 12.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063090472 P | KR20210129188 | 29.09.2021 Original published format: KR 20210129188 | [2023/33] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022080741 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4228348 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, H04W72/04, H04W72/10, H04L1/18, H04W92/18 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L1/1887 (EP);
H04L1/1893 (EP);
H04W72/563 (US);
H04W72/40 (EP);
H04W72/52 (EP);
H04W72/569 (EP);
H04W92/18 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR RESSOURCENAUSWAHL IN DER SIDELINK-KOMMUNIKATION | [2023/33] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RESOURCE SELECTION IN SIDELINK COMMUNICATION | [2023/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SÉLECTION DE RESSOURCES DANS UNE COMMUNICATION PAR LIAISON LATÉRALE | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2023 | Translation filed | 29.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y] - Qualcomm Incorporated, "Sidelink Resource Allocation Mechanism for NR V2X", 3GPP Draft; R1-1909254_Sidelink Resource Allocation Mechanism for NR V2X, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20190817), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20190826 - 20190830, pages 1 - 17, XP051765859 [Y] 3,5,9-17 | [Y] - Huawei, HiSilicon, "Discussion on remaining MAC open issues for 5G V2X with NR SL", 3GPP Draft; R2-2003555, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20200410), vol. RAN WG2, no. electronic; 20200420 - 20200430, XP051871480 [Y] 3,11,13-17 * See pages 1-28. * | [Y] - OPPO, "Discussions on resource reservation, sensing and selection in Mode 2", 3GPP Draft; R1-1908366 OPPO - mode 2 RA, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20190816), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20190826 - 20190830, XP051764974 [Y] 5,12,16 * See pages 1-9. * | [Y] - Samsung, "On Resource Allocation Mechanisms for NR V2X", 3GPP Draft; R1-1902276 on Resource Allocation Mechanisms for NR V2X, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20190215), vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20190225 - 20190301, XP051599971 [Y] 9-10 * See pages 1-6. * | [A] - Spreadtrum Communications, "Discussion on NR sidelink Mode 2 resource allocation", 3GPP Draft; R1-1910007 Discussion on NR sidelink Mode 2 resource allocation_final, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20191001), vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191020, XP051788814 [A] 1-20 * See pages 1-4. * |