EP4071884 - BATTERY PACK AND DEVICE INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Jongmok Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jieun Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/41] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21880408.6 | 07.10.2021 | [2022/41] | WO2021KR13821 | Priority number, date | KR20200131091 | 12.10.2020 Original published format: KR 20200131091 | [2022/41] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022080761 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4071884 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/42, H01M50/20, H01M50/502, H01M50/271, H01M10/613, H01M50/204 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
H01M50/204 (EP,US);
H01M10/4207 (KR,US);
H01M10/425 (EP,US);
H01M10/42 (KR);
H01M10/613 (EP);
H01M50/20 (KR);
H01M50/271 (EP);
H01M50/502 (KR);
H01M50/507 (US);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2010/4278 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/41] | H01M10/42, H01M50/20, H01M50/502 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK UND VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2022/41] | English: | BATTERY PACK AND DEVICE INCLUDING SAME | [2022/41] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2022 | Translation filed | 07.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2017331159 (KESER GORAN [DE], et al); | [I]US2019252734 (RAZZELL CHARLES J [US]) | International search | [A]KR20110071343 (SK INNOVATION CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20120134004 ; | [A]KR20140121186 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20180112617 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [YA]KR20190034868 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) |