EP4202463 - CHARGE/DISCHARGE TEST SYSTEM AND CHARGE/DISCHARGE TEST METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWON, Ji-Yoon Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sang-Min Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
JANG, Min-Chul Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21880518.2 | 13.10.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021KR14149 | Priority number, date | KR20200132068 | 13.10.2020 Original published format: KR 20200132068 | [2023/26] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022080871 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202463 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/392, G01R31/382, G01R31/36, H02J7/00 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G01R31/386 (EP);
G01R31/392 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/3646 (KR);
G01R31/3648 (KR);
G01R31/374 (US);
G01R31/382 (KR);
G01R31/3835 (US);
H02J7/0013 (US);
H02J7/0047 (EP,KR);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
H02J7/005 (EP);
H02J7/00712 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | LADE-/ENTLADETESTSYSTEM UND LADE-/ENTLADETESTVERFAHREN | [2023/26] | English: | CHARGE/DISCHARGE TEST SYSTEM AND CHARGE/DISCHARGE TEST METHOD | [2023/26] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TEST DE CHARGE/DÉCHARGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TEST DE CHARGE/DÉCHARGE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2023 | Translation filed | 24.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5160880 (PALANISAMY THIRUMALAI G [US]) [I] 1-10 * column 13, line 57 - column 14, line 60; figures 1,2,10-12 *; | [A]JP2001102097 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2020217898 (LEE YOUNG-KUG [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0071]; figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]JP2001102097 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-10 * See entire document. *; | [A]JP2003243048 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al) [A] 1-10 * See claims 1-2. *; | [A]KR20080096953 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See claims 1-5. *; | [A]KR20160105349 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10* See entire document. *; | [A]KR20200086397 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0036] and [0053]-[0064]. * | by applicant | KR20200132068 |