EP4236259 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION MODULE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORISHITA, Tatsuya Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIKAWA, Masaaki Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO, Michihiro Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
KANDA, Hiroto Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
SASAKI, Ayumi Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex, Geneva / CH | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 21882651.9 | 12.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021JP37666 | Priority number, date | JP20200176863 | 21.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020176863 | [2023/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022085510 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4236259 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/51, // H04L67/303 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H04L67/51 (EP);
H04W12/06 (US);
H04W12/69 (US);
H04L67/303 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | H04L67/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSMODUL, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2023/35] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION MODULE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2023/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE, MODULE DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2023 | Translation filed | 12.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2004098515 (REZVANI BABAK [US], et al); | [XI]US2014173069 (KIM SUNG-WON [KR], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2004240915 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2006260027 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JP2014192675 (PANASONIC CORP) | by applicant | JP2018067352 |