EP4235287 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ELECTRONIC LIGHT CONTROL DEVICE, ELECTRONIC ELEMENT FOR LIGHT CONTROL, AND ELECTRONIC LIGHT CONTROL EYEGLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoya Lens Thailand Ltd. 853 Phaholyothin Road Prachatipat Thanyaburi Pathumthani 12130 / TH | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAZAKI Shigeki Tokyo 160-8347 / JP | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 21882807.7 | 19.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021JP38550 | Priority number, date | JP20200175961 | 20.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020175961 | [2023/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022085666 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4235287 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/15, G02C7/10, G02F1/155 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
G02C7/101 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02F1/155 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02F1/1533 (KR);
G02F1/157 (EP,US);
G02F1/163 (CN,KR);
G02C2202/16 (EP,US);
G02F2201/56 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN LICHTSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHES ELEMENT ZUR LICHTSTEUERUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE LICHTSTEUERUNGSBRILLE | [2023/35] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ELECTRONIC LIGHT CONTROL DEVICE, ELECTRONIC ELEMENT FOR LIGHT CONTROL, AND ELECTRONIC LIGHT CONTROL EYEGLASSES | [2023/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION ÉLECTRONIQUE DE LUMIÈRE, ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR RÉGULATION DE LUMIÈRE ET LUNETTES DE RÉGULATION ÉLECTRONIQUE DE LUMIÈRE | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2023 | Translation filed | 10.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2014106265 (HOYA CORP); | [Y]JP2016509264 ; | [Y]JP2016148805 (RICOH CO LTD); | [YX]WO2017104466 (RICOH CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2017526949 | by applicant | JPH0324206B | JP5511997B |