EP4235683 - HEALTH IMPROVEMENT PATH SEARCH DEVICE AND HEALTH IMPROVEMENT PATH SEARCH METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyowa Hakko Bio Co., Ltd. 1-6-1 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | For all designated states HIROSAKI UNIVERSITY 1, Bunkyo-cho Hirosaki-shi, Aomori 036-8560 / JP | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Kazuki Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | 02 /
OKUNO, Yasushi Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 03 /
KOJIMA, Ryosuke Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 04 /
UCHINO, Eiichiro Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 05 /
MURASHITA, Koichi Hirosaki-shi, Aomori 036-8560 / JP | 06 /
ITOH, Ken Hirosaki-shi, Aomori 036-8560 / JP | 07 /
NAKAJI, Shigeyuki Hirosaki-shi, Aomori 036-8560 / JP | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 21882924.0 | 22.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021JP39081 | Priority number, date | JP20200178148 | 23.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020178148 | [2023/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022085785 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4235683 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/00, G16H50/20, G16H50/30, G16H50/50, G16H50/70, A61B5/00 | [2024/37] | CPC: |
G16H50/70 (EP,US);
G16H20/00 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
G16H50/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | G16H20/00, A61B5/00, G16H50/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SUCHE NACH GESUNDHEITSVERBESSERUNGSPFADEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR SUCHE NACH GESUNDHEITSVERBESSERUNGSPFADEN | [2023/35] | English: | HEALTH IMPROVEMENT PATH SEARCH DEVICE AND HEALTH IMPROVEMENT PATH SEARCH METHOD | [2023/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECHERCHE DE VOIE D'AMÉLIORATION DE SANTÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE RECHERCHE DE VOIE D'AMÉLIORATION DE SANTÉ | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2023 | Translation filed | 22.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014058738 (YESKEL FILIP J [US]); | [A]US2018089385 (GUPTA ABHIJIT MANOHAR [IN], et al); | [I]CN108717863 (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES INC ZHUHAI); | [A]EP3624133 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | International search | [A]JP2009211126 (IIZUKA YOSHIKATSU, et al); | [A]US2014058738 (YESKEL FILIP J [US]); | [A]JP2018055424 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2020003882 (INSTITUTE PHYSICAL & CHEMICAL RES, et al); | [A]JP2020042761 (HITACHI LTD) | by applicant | JP2009217703 |