EP4236558 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNAL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | 29.12.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS, INC. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Suckchel Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Seonwook Seoul 06772 / KR | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/35] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21883321.8 | 22.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021KR14880 | Priority number, date | KR20200137777 | 22.10.2020 Original published format: KR 20200137777 | KR20210044272 | 05.04.2021 Original published format: KR 20210044272 | KR20210130236 | 30.09.2021 Original published format: KR 20210130236 | [2023/35] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022086254 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4236558 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04L1/00 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
H04L5/0055 (EP,US);
H04W72/21 (EP,US);
H04L1/1614 (EP);
H04L1/1671 (EP);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04L1/1861 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04W72/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN EINES SIGNALS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2023/35] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNAL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2023/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION D'UN SIGNAL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2023 | Translation filed | 22.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2019239216 (KUNDU LOPAMUDRA [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0028], [0053] and [0236]; and claim 1. *; | [A]US2019261361 (XIONG GANG [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * See paragraph [0079]; and claim 21. *; | [A]WO2020092264 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraph [0044]; and claim 1. *; | [A]US2020296716 (LIN WAN-CHEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0071]-[0080]; and claim 1. *; | [A] - Nokia, Nokia Shanghai Bell, "On Rel-17 UL intra-UE prioritization and multiplexing enhancements of traffic with different priorities", 3GPP Draft; R1-2006340, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20200807), vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20200817 - 20200828, XP051915311 [A] 1-14 * See sections 3-4. * |