EP4233576 - TOBACCO PRODUCT AND PLANT-FLAVORED FILTER STICK THEREOF, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Huabao Biology Technology Co., Ltd. Area B, Second Floor, Building 3 No. 1180, Xingxian Rd., Jiading District Shanghai 201800 / CN | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Xu Shanghai 201800 / CN | 02 /
SHEN, Li Shanghai 201800 / CN | 03 /
XU, Xiaodong Shanghai 201800 / CN | 04 /
LIANG, Jiasheng Shanghai 201800 / CN | 05 /
YING, Yu Shanghai 201800 / CN | 06 /
CAO, Tongtong Shanghai 201800 / CN | 07 /
FU, Yuanfeng Shanghai 201800 / CN | 08 /
YAO, Jianwen Shanghai 201800 / CN | 09 /
SUN, Wenxuan Shanghai 201800 / CN | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 21885175.6 | 26.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021CN126504 | Priority number, date | CN202011163680 | 27.10.2020 Original published format: CN202011163680 | [2023/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022089448 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4233576 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A24D1/04, A24D3/17, A24D1/20, A24D3/04, // A24D3/02 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
A24D1/20 (EP,CN);
A24D1/04 (CN);
A24D3/022 (EP,CN);
A24D3/0229 (CN);
A24D3/048 (EP);
A24D3/17 (CN);
A24D3/0237 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | A24D1/04, A24D3/17, A24D1/20, A24D3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | TABAKPRODUKT UND FILTERSTAB MIT PFLANZENGESCHMACK DARAUS SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/35] | English: | TOBACCO PRODUCT AND PLANT-FLAVORED FILTER STICK THEREOF, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/35] | French: | PRODUIT DE TABAC ET SON BÂTONNET DE FILTRE AROMATISÉ AUX PLANTES, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2023 | Translation filed | 24.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 26.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN105614947 (YUNNAN YANGRUI TECH GROUP CO LTD); | [Y]CN209391076U (SHANGHAI HUABAO BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [XAYI]CN111728267 (SHANGHAI HUABAO BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) |