EP4234731 - WOUND CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 03.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA, Yusuke Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
MIZUMURA, Takahito Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 21886238.1 | 26.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021JP39560 | Priority number, date | JP20200179266 | 26.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020179266 | [2023/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022092120 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4234731 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/12, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, H01F41/02, C22C38/60, H01F3/02, H01F1/147, H01F27/245, // C21D1/26, C21D1/76, C21D3/04, C21D6/00, C21D9/46, C22C38/06, C22C38/16, C22C38/12 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01F27/245 (EP,KR,US);
C21D1/74 (US);
C21D3/04 (EP,US);
C21D6/005 (US);
C21D6/008 (EP,US);
C21D8/12 (KR);
C21D8/1222 (EP,US);
C21D8/1233 (EP,US);
C21D8/1255 (EP,US);
C21D8/1261 (EP,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/004 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,US);
C22C38/16 (EP,US);
C22C38/60 (KR);
H01F1/147 (KR);
H01F1/14775 (EP,US);
H01F3/02 (EP);
H01F41/0233 (EP);
C21D1/26 (EP);
C21D1/76 (EP);
C21D2201/05 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | C21D8/12, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/60, H01F1/147, H01F27/245 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | WICKELKERN | [2023/35] | English: | WOUND CORE | [2023/35] | French: | NOYAU ENROULÉ | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2023 | Translation filed | 19.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 03.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2018148036 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP); | [I]JP2018157142 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP); | [A]EP3726543 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) | International search | [Y]JPH07268474 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [Y]JP2000114064 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [Y]JP2018148036 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) | by applicant | JPH0689805 | JPH08134660 | JPH10183313 | JP2001192785 | JP2005240079 | JP2005286169 | JP2012052229 | AU2012337260 | JP6224468B | JP2018148036 | JP2020179266 |