EP4070867 - SYSTEM, APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING BITMAP FOR PERFORMANCE SCENE PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fanlight Co., Ltd. 5F, 6F, 22, Nonhyeon-ro 128-gil Gangnam--gu Seoul 06105 / KR | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Kyung Il Seoul 06011 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Jung Min Seoul 06011 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Hyun Gil Seoul 06045 / KR | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 21887871.8 | 27.04.2021 | [2022/41] | WO2021KR05319 | Priority number, date | KR20210018979 | 10.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210018979 | [2022/41] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022173074 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070867 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.08.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05B47/155, H05B47/19, A63J5/02, H05B47/10, H04W4/30, H04W72/04, F21V23/04 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
H05B47/19 (EP,US);
A63J5/02 (KR,US);
F21V23/045 (KR);
H04W4/30 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (KR);
H05B47/10 (KR);
H05B47/155 (EP,US);
H05B47/165 (US);
H04W4/33 (US);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/41] | A63J5/02, F21V23/04, H05B47/10, H04W4/30, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER BITMAP FÜR DIE PRODUKTION VON LEISTUNGSSZENEN | [2022/41] | English: | SYSTEM, APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING BITMAP FOR PERFORMANCE SCENE PRODUCTION | [2022/41] | French: | SYSTÈME, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE MATRICE DE POINTS POUR LA PRODUCTION DE SCÈNES DE SPECTACLE | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2022 | Translation filed | 10.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 12.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2367166 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [Y]US2014354153 (PULIDO JR GABRIEL [US]); | [XYI]WO2019093888 (ELDOLAB HOLDING BV [NL]); | [XYI]EP3726491 (BIGHIT ENTERTAINMENT CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]KR20060033563 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0037]. *; | [A]US7697925 (WILSON THOMAS H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See claim 1 and figures 1-3. *; | [A]JP2015011981 (TEAM LAB INC) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0042] and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]KR20190070220 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 2-4,10-12 * See paragraphs [0164]-[0215] and figures 1-5 and 12-14. *; | [XYA]KR20200123735 (BEATRO CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,8-9 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0040] and [0060]-[0103] and figures 1-23. * [Y] 2-4,10-12 [A] 5-7,13-15; | [PX]KR20210035106 (FANLIGHT CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1-10* See claims 1-10. (This document is a published earlier application that serves as a basis for claiming priority of the present international application.) * |