EP4241909 - BAND SAW MACHINE, METHOD FOR COOLING BAND SAW BLADE, AND METHOD FOR CUTTING WORKPIECE USING BAND SAW MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amada Co., Ltd. 200, Ishida Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | For all designated states Amada Machinery Co., Ltd. 200 Ishida, Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAI Norihisa Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21889222.2 | 04.11.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021JP40540 | Priority number, date | JP20200186458 | 09.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020186458 | [2023/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022097669 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4241909 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B23D59/04, B23D59/00, B23Q11/00, B23Q11/10, // B23D53/04 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
B23D59/04 (EP,US);
B23D55/065 (US);
B23D59/006 (EP);
B23D53/04 (EP);
Y02P70/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | B23D55/00, B23D59/04, B23Q11/00, B23Q11/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | BANDSÄGEMASCHINE, VERFAHREN ZUM KÜHLEN EINES BANDSÄGEBLATTS UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN EINES WERKSTÜCKS MITHILFE DER BANDSÄGEMASCHINE | [2023/37] | English: | BAND SAW MACHINE, METHOD FOR COOLING BAND SAW BLADE, AND METHOD FOR CUTTING WORKPIECE USING BAND SAW MACHINE | [2023/37] | French: | MACHINE À SCIER À RUBAN, PROCÉDÉ DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE LAME DE SCIE À RUBAN ET PROCÉDÉ DE COUPE DE PIÈCE À TRAVAILLER À L'AIDE D'UNE MACHINE À SCIER À RUBAN | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2023 | Translation filed | 03.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 18.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AX]US4608892 (NOIZET ERWIN [DE]) [A] 2-5 [X] 1; | [A]JP2001150239 (AMADA CO LTD) [A] 1-5; | [Y]JP2001170817 (AMADA CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0016]-[0032], fig. 1-4 *; | [A]US2005081690 (BIRO MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2009113173 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK)[A] 1-5; | [Y]US2009255390 (CHAFFIN PHILLIP L [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0020]-[0064], fig. 1-7 * | by applicant | JP2004283938 | JP2011025384 | JP2022186458 |