EP4191383 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING FLEXIBLE DISPLAY, AND OPERATING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Wankyu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Raetae Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Bohyeon Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
MIN, Byungwoo Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
CHO, Joongyeon Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
CHOI, Junwoo Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 07 /
PARK, Jihea Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21889455.8 | 27.10.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021KR15227 | Priority number, date | KR20200147810 | 06.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200147810 | KR20210008453 | 21.01.2021 Original published format: KR 20210008453 | [2023/23] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022097990 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4191383 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/3234, G06F1/3212, G06F1/16, G09F9/30 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
G09G3/035 (EP,US);
G06F1/16 (EP);
G06F1/1624 (EP);
G06F1/1652 (EP);
G06F1/1677 (EP);
G06F1/3212 (EP);
G06F1/3234 (EP);
G06F1/3265 (EP);
G06F3/0481 (EP);
G09F9/30 (EP);
G09G3/3208 (EP,US);
H05K5/0017 (US);
H05K5/0086 (US);
H10K77/111 (US);
G06F2203/04803 (EP);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G2340/04 (EP);
G09G2340/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT FLEXIBLER ANZEIGE UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/23] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING FLEXIBLE DISPLAY, AND OPERATING METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE À AFFICHAGE FLEXIBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DUDIT DISPOSITIF | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2023 | Translation filed | 02.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 27.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014189583 (YANG WENLONG [CN]); | [Y]US2018033406 (PARK JI SUN [KR], et al); | [Y]US2019384438 (PARK HONGSIK [KR], et al) | International search | [A]US2003146897 (HUNTER ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0022]-[0023]; and figure 4. *; | [Y]JP2016506566 (INTEL CORPORATION) [Y] 2-4,6-9,11-15 * See paragraphs [0010], [0020], [0028] and [0038]. *; | [Y]KR20180014494 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See claims 1-2 and 12-13. *; | [A]KR101978206B (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [A] 1-15 * See claim 17. *; | [Y]KR20190141518 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0004] and [0104]; and claims 18 and 24. * |