EP4243429 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING MULTICAST SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWON, Woosuk Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
YOON, Joonhee Seoul 06772 / KR | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/37] | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21889535.7 | 03.11.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021KR15747 | Priority number, date | KR20200145393 | 03.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200145393 | [2023/37] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022098070 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4243429 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/6405, H04N21/443, H04N21/4725, H04L9/40, H04L65/40, H04L65/75, H04L67/148, H04W4/06 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
H04L65/611 (EP);
H04N21/23805 (EP,US);
H04L65/103 (EP);
H04L65/75 (EP);
H04N21/6405 (EP);
H04N21/8456 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | H04N21/6405, H04N21/443, H04N21/4725, H04L9/40, H04L65/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES MULTICAST-SIGNALS | [2023/37] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING MULTICAST SIGNAL | [2023/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL DE MULTIDIFFUSION | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2023 | Translation filed | 31.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP3588847 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [X]DE112018002893T (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [E]EP4175259 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | International search | [A]US7768913 (SHEPHERD GREGORY J [US], et al); | [A]KR20120085508 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]); | [A]US2016173547 (NORTZ DOUGLAS M [US], et al); | [A]US2020029101 (SALINGER JORGE [US], et al); |