EP4222633 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR XBRL TAG SUGGESTION AND VALIDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | 05.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Workiva Inc. 2900 University Boulevard Ames, IA 50010 / US | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODMAN, Rollie, Diane Philadelphia, PA 19127 / US | 02 /
KING, Houston, Dean Bozeman, MT 59718 / US | 03 /
BREECHER, Michael Phoenix, AZ 85015 / US | 04 /
CUPPS, Edward, Joseph Ames, IA 50014 / US | 05 /
KHARBUSH, Alex Muscatine, IA 52761 / US | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 21889788.2 | 15.09.2021 | [2023/32] | WO2021US50392 | Priority number, date | US202017089211 | 04.11.2020 Original published format: US202017089211 | [2023/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022098435 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4222633 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F40/117 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
G06F40/117 (EP,US);
G06F18/2148 (US);
G06F40/14 (US);
G06F40/226 (US);
G06F40/279 (EP);
G06N3/04 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR XBRL-ETIKETT-VORSCHLAG UND -VALIDIERUNG | [2023/32] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR XBRL TAG SUGGESTION AND VALIDATION | [2023/32] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR SUGGESTION ET VALIDATION D'ÉTIQUETTE XBRL | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 16.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2013007033 (BROWN ERIC W [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * , entire document. *; | [Y]US2013117268 (SMITH BEN [GB], et al) [Y] 1-20 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2013262981 (HAILA DAVID ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2017069020 (GOYAL AMIT [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document. *; | [Y] - Frank Xing, Erik Cambria, Roy Welsch, "cover page + index", Intelligent Asset Management, Switzerland AG, Springer, (20181130), pages 1 - 156, ISBN 978-3-030-30262-7, XP009544348 [Y] 7, 10, 12 and 13 * entire document. * |