EP4240389 - VIRAL VECTORS ENCODING CANINE INSULIN FOR TREATMENT OF METABOLIC DISEASES IN DOGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | 05.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3600 Civic Center Boulevard, 9th Floor Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, James, M. Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | 02 /
HINDERER, Christian Baltimore, MD 21217 / US | 03 /
HORIUCHI, Makoto Wallingford, PA 19086 / US | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21890086.8 | 04.11.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021US58105 | Priority number, date | US202063109620P | 04.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063109620 P | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022098906 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4240389 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K38/28, A61K48/00, C12N15/86 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
A61K48/005 (EP,US);
C07K14/62 (EP,US);
A61K35/761 (EP);
A61K38/28 (EP);
A61P3/10 (US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | VIRALE VEKTOREN, DIE FÜR HUNDEINSULIN KODIEREN, ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON STOFFWECHSELKRANKHEITEN BEI HUNDEN | [2023/37] | English: | VIRAL VECTORS ENCODING CANINE INSULIN FOR TREATMENT OF METABOLIC DISEASES IN DOGS | [2023/37] | French: | VECTEURS VIRAUX CODANT POUR L'INSULINE DE CHIEN POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES MÉTABOLIQUES CHEZ LES CHIENS | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 13.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2006079354 (UNIV BRUXELLES [BE], et al) [Y] 1-5, 9 * abstract; p. 11, In 5-12 *; | [Y]US2009304665 (FROST GREGORY I [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,9 * abstract; para [0103]-[0104]; [0312]-[0319]; [0339]; SEQ ID NO: 110 *; | [A]WO2012007458 (UNIV BARCELONA AUTONOMA [ES], et al) [A] 1-5,9* p. 5, In 30 to p. 6, In 5; p. 8, In 5-13 * |