EP4236052 - POWER SUPPLY DEVICE, CIRCUIT CONTROL METHOD AND POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | For all designated states Powerland Technology Inc. 12F Building A, Baixia High Tech Park No. 6 Yongzhi Road Qinhuai District Nanjing Jiangsu 210001 / CN | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIAN, Chen Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Jialiang Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Jingpeng Nanjing, Jiangsu 210001 / CN | 04 /
LU, Weiwei Nanjing, Jiangsu 210001 / CN | 05 /
SUN, Juanjuan Nanjing, Jiangsu 210001 / CN | 06 /
SUN, Julu Nanjing, Jiangsu 210001 / CN | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/35] | Ipside 7-9 Allées Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 21890797.0 | 13.09.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021CN118072 | Priority number, date | CN202011262842 | 12.11.2020 Original published format: CN202011262842 | [2023/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022100269 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4236052 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/04, H02M1/00, H02M1/14, // H02J7/02, H02M3/158, H02M3/335 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H02M1/143 (EP,US);
H02M7/04 (CN);
H02M3/1582 (EP,US);
H02J7/0068 (CN);
H02J7/02 (EP,CN);
H02J7/34 (CN);
H02J7/345 (CN);
H02M1/0009 (US);
H02M1/007 (EP);
H02M1/0077 (US);
H02M3/00 (CN);
H02M3/04 (CN);
H02M3/24 (CN);
H02J2207/50 (CN);
H02M3/01 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | H02M7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SCHALTUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND STROMVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/35] | English: | POWER SUPPLY DEVICE, CIRCUIT CONTROL METHOD AND POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM | [2023/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CIRCUIT ET SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2023 | Translation filed | 26.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 31.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013187595 (BUCHER ALEXANDER [DE], et al); | [Y]EP3079252 (PR ELECTRONICS AS [DK]); | [Y]US2017099710 (LIU YAN-FEI [CA]); |