EP4246643 - SULFIDE BASED SOLID ELECTROLYTE, SOLID ELECTROLYTE LAYER, AND LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | 12.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC INC. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008405 / JP | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII, Naoki Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
NISHIZAWA, Manabu Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 03 /
HAYASHI, Hideaki Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21891781.3 | 05.11.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021JP40790 | Priority number, date | JP20200188040 | 11.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020188040 | [2023/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022102535 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4246643 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0562, C01B25/10, C01B25/14, H01B1/06, H01B1/10 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
C01B25/14 (EP);
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR,US);
C01B17/22 (EP);
H01B1/06 (EP);
H01B1/10 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/82 (EP);
C01P2002/88 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2006/90 (EP);
H01M2300/0068 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | FESTELEKTROLYT AUF SULFIDBASIS, FESTELEKTROLYTSCHICHT UND LITHIUM-IONEN-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2023/38] | English: | SULFIDE BASED SOLID ELECTROLYTE, SOLID ELECTROLYTE LAYER, AND LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY | [2023/38] | French: | ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE À BASE DE SULFURE, COUCHE D'ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM-ION | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2023 | Translation filed | 11.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2019114525 (HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-7; | [A]JP2019145299 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-7; | [A]US2020087155 (RUPERT BENJAMIN [US]) [A] 1-7; | [A]CN111916738 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD, et al)[A] 1-7 | by applicant | WO2015012042 | JP2020188040 |