EP4245560 - BALLPOINT PEN TIP, BALLPOINT PEN REFILL, AND BALLPOINT PEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Pilot Corporation (also trading as Pilot Corporation) 6-21, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8304 / JP | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAJIWARA Takumi Tokyo 104-8304 / JP | 02 /
MASUSHIGE Naoto Tokyo 104-8304 / JP | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21892021.3 | 15.11.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021JP41929 | Priority number, date | JP20200190522 | 16.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020190522 | JP20200190525 | 16.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020190525 | JP20210184770 | 12.11.2021 Original published format: JP 2021184770 | JP20210184782 | 12.11.2021 Original published format: JP 2021184782 | [2023/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022102776 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4245560 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B43K1/08, B43K7/10 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
C09D11/18 (EP,KR);
B43K1/08 (KR);
B43K1/084 (KR,US);
B43K1/082 (KR);
B43K1/086 (EP,KR);
B43K1/088 (KR,US);
B43K7/02 (KR);
B43K7/10 (EP,US);
B43K7/12 (EP);
C09D11/50 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | B43K1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | KUGELSCHREIBERSPITZE, NACHFÜLLUNG FÜR KUGELSCHREIBER UND KUGELSCHREIBER | [2023/38] | English: | BALLPOINT PEN TIP, BALLPOINT PEN REFILL, AND BALLPOINT PEN | [2023/38] | French: | POINTE DE STYLO À BILLE, RECHARGE DE STYLO À BILLE, ET STYLO À BILLE | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2023 | Translation filed | 13.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2014008629 (PILOT CORP) [Y] 6,7,9* paragraph [0019]; figures 1-5 *; | [XYI]JP2015202688 (PILOT CORP) [X] 1,8,10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraphs [0014] - [0028]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 6,7,9 [I] 2-5 | International search | [A]JP2011240503 (PILOT CORP) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0014], [0025], [0027]-[0028], fig. 1-2 *; | [A]JP2013151153 (PENTEL KK) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0011]-[0017], [0024], [0029], [0032], fig. 1-7, table 1 *; | [A]JP2017200748 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0015], [0028], [0031], [0041], [0048], fig. 1-6 *; | [A]JP2018035334 (PENTEL KK) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0053], [0057], fig. 8-9 *; | [A]WO2020007653 (SOCIÉTÉ BIC [FR]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0034], [0046], fig. 3-5 * | by applicant | JP2002052884 | JP2012006315 |