EP4247066 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING SIDELINK RETRANSMISSION OPERATION IN SL DRX ON-DURATION IN NR V2X [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Giwon Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
BACK, Seoyoung Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Seungmin Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
HONG, Jongwoo Seoul 06772 / KR | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/38] | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21892314.2 | 10.11.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021KR16333 | Priority number, date | KR20200151062 | 12.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200151062 | KR20200153859 | 17.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200153859 | [2023/38] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022103147 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4247066 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W76/28, H04W76/14, H04W72/12, H04L1/18, H04W4/40, H04W92/18 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP,KR);
H04W76/28 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/1812 (KR);
H04L1/1851 (EP);
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04W4/40 (EP,KR);
H04W76/14 (EP,KR);
H04W76/23 (US);
H04W92/18 (EP,KR);
Y02D30/70 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER SIDELINK-NEUÜBERTRAGUNGSOPERATION IN SL-DRX-EINSCHALTDAUER IN NR V2X | [2023/38] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING SIDELINK RETRANSMISSION OPERATION IN SL DRX ON-DURATION IN NR V2X | [2023/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR RÉALISER UNE OPÉRATION DE RETRANSMISSION DE LIAISON LATÉRALE PENDANT UNE DURÉE D'ACTIVITÉ D'UNE DRX SL DANS NR V2X | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2023 | Translation filed | 09.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20200093517 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [YA]CN111699723 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD); |